DC PR22-0560 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public Charter School Board Naomi Shelton Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Charter School Board Naomi Shelton Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-12-12CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0560
2017-12-08CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2017-11-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2017-10-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0560 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-17CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback