DC PR22-0554 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Resolution R22-0304 Effective from December 8, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12414
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Resolution R22-0304 Effective from December 8, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12414
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mayor Marion Barry, Jr. Memorial Statue Commemorative Works Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Mayor Marion Barry, Jr. Memorial Statue Commemorative Works Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-21 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | Council | Resolution R22-0304 Effective from December 8, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12414 |
2017-12-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0304 |
2017-11-21 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0554 |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0554 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-26 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-10-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-10-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |