DC PR22-0526 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Reciprocity Rulemaking Approval Resolution Of 2017
Title
Medical Marijuana Reciprocity Rulemaking Approval Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-10-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0526 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR22-0526 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38927/PR22-0526-Introduction.pdf |