DC PR22-0520 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-10-13 | Council | Resolution R22-0247 Effective from October 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10206 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0247 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |