DC PR22-0481 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Resolution R22-0386 Effective from January 9, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 602
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rental Housing Commission Lisa M. Gregory Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental Housing Commission Lisa M. Gregory Confirmation Resolution Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26CouncilResolution R22-0386 Effective from January 9, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 602
2018-01-09CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R22-0386
2018-01-09CouncilFinal Reading
2018-01-03CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-03CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR22-0481
2017-12-08CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR22-0481 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback