DC PR22-0286 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Resolution R22-0114 Effective from May 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4957
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Resolution R22-0114 Effective from May 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4957
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Paymentech LLC
Title
Contract No. Cfopd-17-c-009 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Council | Resolution R22-0114 Effective from May 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4957 |
2017-05-16 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0114 |
2017-05-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |