DC PR22-0056 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Resolution R22-0017 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4704
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Resolution R22-0017 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4704
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Board Of Directors Warner H. Session Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Board Of Directors Warner H. Session Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Council | Resolution R22-0017 Effective from February 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4704 |
2017-05-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-02-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0056 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0017 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-01-31 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0056 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |