DC PR22-0003 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Resolution R22-0003 Effective from January 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 306
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Resolution R22-0003 Effective from January 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 306
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Counsel To The Council Of The District Of Columbia Ellen Efros Reappointment Resolution Of 2017
Title
General Counsel To The Council Of The District Of Columbia Ellen Efros Reappointment Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | Council | Resolution R22-0003 Effective from January 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 306 |
2017-01-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-01-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0003 |
2017-01-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |