DC PR20-0935 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0662 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - Resolution R20-0662 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Tax Appeals Commission Mr. Donald L. Issac, Jr. Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Title
Real Property Tax Appeals Commission Mr. Donald L. Issac, Jr. Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Council | Resolution R20-0662 Effective from Oct 28, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11981 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-10-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0935 |
2014-09-24 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0935 |
2014-09-12 | Council | Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-14 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2014-07-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0935 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-06-30 | Council | PR20-0935 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |