DC CER25-0245 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Resolution ACR25-0243, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008652
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Resolution ACR25-0243, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008652
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
SCOUT Bags 20th Anniversary Celebration Recognition Resolution of 2024
Title
SCOUT Bags 20th Anniversary Celebration Recognition Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0243, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008652 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0243 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |