DC CER24-0127 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Resolution ACR24-0124, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001291
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Edward C. Smith Recognition Resolution of 2022

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Edward C. Smith Recognition Resolution of 2022

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-18CouncilResolution ACR24-0124, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001291
2022-02-01CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR24-0124
2022-02-01CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2022-02-01CouncilRetained by the Council
2022-01-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback