DC CER24-0070 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Resolution ACR24-0069, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 008034
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Resolution ACR24-0069, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 008034
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Harry White 105th Birthday Ceremonial Resolution of 2021
Title
Harry White 105th Birthday Ceremonial Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0069, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 008034 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0069 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-07-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |