DC CER24-0017 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Resolution ACR24-0017, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 003215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Resolution ACR24-0017, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 003215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crime Victims’ Rights Week Recognition Resolution of 2021
Title
Crime Victims’ Rights Week Recognition Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Council | Resolution ACR24-0017, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 003215 |
2021-03-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR24-0017 |
2021-03-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-03-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-02-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |