DC CER23-0343 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution ACR23-0342, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000838
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution ACR23-0342, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000838
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pierpont and Jeannette Mobley Washington, D.C. Hall of Fame Induction Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Pierpont and Jeannette Mobley Washington, D.C. Hall of Fame Induction Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0342, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000838 |
2021-01-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0342 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |