DC CER23-0137 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Resolution ACR23-0137, Effective from Feb 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Resolution ACR23-0137, Effective from Feb 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The D.C. Afro-Latino Heritage and Culture Week Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
The D.C. Afro-Latino Heritage and Culture Week Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0137, Effective from Feb 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1123 |
2020-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0137 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-09-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |