DC CER23-0122 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0122, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14873
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0122, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14873
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Woodrow Wilson High School Crew 2019 National Championship Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Woodrow Wilson High School Crew 2019 National Championship Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0122, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14873 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0122 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |