DC CER23-0106 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0106, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14840
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0106, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14840
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marion S. Barry Summer Youth Employment Program 40th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Marion S. Barry Summer Youth Employment Program 40th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0106, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14840 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0106 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |