DC CER23-0067 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Resolution ACR23-0067, Effective from Oct 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Resolution ACR23-0067, Effective from Oct 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baptist Ministers' Wives and Widows Association of Washington, D.C. and Vicinity, Inc. Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Baptist Ministers' Wives and Widows Association of Washington, D.C. and Vicinity, Inc. Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0067, Effective from Oct 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13563 |
2019-10-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0067 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |