DC CER23-0052 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Resolution ACR23-0052, Effective from Apr 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4961
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Resolution ACR23-0052, Effective from Apr 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4961
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jewish American Heritage Month Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
Jewish American Heritage Month Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0052, Effective from Apr 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4961 |
2019-04-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0052 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |