DC CER22-0378 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Resolution ACR22-0378 Effective from November 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12085
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lamond-riggs Citizens Association's 70th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lamond-riggs Citizens Association's 70th Anniversary Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-02CouncilResolution ACR22-0378 Effective from November 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12085
2018-11-02CouncilApproved with Resolution Number ACR22-0378
2018-09-18CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-09-18CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback