DC CER22-0329 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Resolution ACR22-0329 Effective from August 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Resolution ACR22-0329 Effective from August 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hill's Kitchen 10th Anniversary Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Title
Hill's Kitchen 10th Anniversary Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0329 Effective from August 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9003 |
2018-08-31 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0329 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-05-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |