DC CER22-0255 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Resolution ACR22-0255 Effective from April 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3554
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Resolution ACR22-0255 Effective from April 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3554
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Junkyard Band Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Title
Junkyard Band Recognition Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0255 Effective from April 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3554 |
2018-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0255 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |