DC CER22-0161 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Resolution ACR22-0161 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10936
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-27 - Resolution ACR22-0161 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10936
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Society Of The District Of Columbia 200th Anniversary Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Medical Society Of The District Of Columbia 200th Anniversary Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0161 Effective from October 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10936 |
2017-10-27 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0161 |
2017-10-03 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |