DC CER22-0155 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-20 - Resolution ACR22-0155 Effective from October 20, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10469
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-20 - Resolution ACR22-0155 Effective from October 20, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10469
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
La Tomate Restaurant 30th Anniversary Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
La Tomate Restaurant 30th Anniversary Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-20 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0155 Effective from October 20, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10469 |
2017-10-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0155 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-07-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |