DC CER22-0142 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Resolution ACR22-0142 Effective from August 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7853
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Resolution ACR22-0142 Effective from August 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7853
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calvin Coolidge Senior High School Class Of 1967 Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Title
Calvin Coolidge Senior High School Class Of 1967 Ceremonial Recognition Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Council | Resolution ACR22-0142 Effective from August 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7853 |
2017-08-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR22-0142 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-06-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |