DC B25-0913 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-23 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-23 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pilot Truancy Reduction Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Pilot Truancy Reduction Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024 |
2024-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-07-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0913 Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-09 | Council | First Reading |
2024-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |