DC B25-0835 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Walter Reed Development Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Walter Reed Development Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Council - Postponed Indefinitely (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Council | Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0835 Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | First Reading |
2024-06-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |