DC B25-0597 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Act A25-0339 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016594, Expires on Mar 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Act A25-0339 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016594, Expires on Mar 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prioritizing Public Safety Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Prioritizing Public Safety Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Council | Act A25-0339 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016594, Expires on Mar 20, 2024 |
2023-12-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-12-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0339, Expires on Mar 20, 2024 |
2023-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |