DC B25-0580 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Law L25-0126, Effective from Feb 22, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002079, Expires on Oct 04, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Law L25-0126, Effective from Feb 22, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002079, Expires on Oct 04, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension Authorization Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension Authorization Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-21 - Council - Amendment (TWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-21 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-21 - Council - Amendment (TWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-21 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Council | Law L25-0126, Effective from Feb 22, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002079, Expires on Oct 04, 2024 |
2024-01-12 | Council | Act A25-0343 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000645 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-01-04 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0343 |
2023-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2024 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0580 Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-21 | Council | Amendment (TWhite) |
2023-11-21 | Council | First Reading |
2023-11-21 | Council | Amendment (RWhite) |
2023-11-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-11-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |