DC B25-0312 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Law L25-0109, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001657
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 25-312 would require that at least 50% of Health Professional Licensing Board positions designated for professional members be filled by District residents at the time of their appointments and while they are members of the board. It also requires that the professional members of each Board be licensed for the health occupation regulated by the Board on which they sit and engaged in the practice of that health occupation in the District for at least 3 years preceding their appointment. It also requires that members who are not District residents be engaged in the practice of the health occupation regulated by the Board in the District while they are members of the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Professional Licensing Boards Residency Requirement Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-16CouncilLaw L25-0109, Effective from Jan 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001657
2023-12-04CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2023-12-01CouncilAct A25-0311 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015466
2023-11-27CouncilReturned from Mayor
2023-11-21CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0311
2023-11-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023
2023-11-07CouncilFinal Reading
2023-10-03CouncilFirst Reading
2023-09-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-09-26CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B25-0312
2023-09-11CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-07-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-06-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-06-09CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0312 Published in the DC Register
2023-06-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-06-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback