DC B25-0293 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Act A25-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009407, Expires on Sep 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Act A25-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009407, Expires on Sep 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rent Stabilized Housing Inflation Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Rent Stabilized Housing Inflation Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Council - Postponed to June 6th Legislative Meeting (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Council - Postponed to June 6th Legislative Meeting (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Council | Act A25-0151 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009407, Expires on Sep 27, 2023 |
2023-06-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-06-29 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0151, Expires on Sep 27, 2023 |
2023-06-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 29, 2023 |
2023-06-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-06-06 | Council | Amendment (R.White, LGeorge, Pinto) |
2023-06-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-05-30 | Council | Amendment (LGeorge, Nadeau, Parker) |
2023-05-30 | Council | Amendment (Pinto as amended by Frumin) |
2023-05-30 | Council | Postponed to June 6th Legislative Meeting |
2023-05-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |