DC B25-0280 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers and Restaurants Are Priorities Act of 2023
Title
Workers and Restaurants Are Priorities Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0280 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0280 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52968/Introduction/B25-0280-Introduction.pdf |