DC B25-0279 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 25-279 would require owners of rental habitations who provide air conditioning to tenants to have individual air conditioning units or central air conditioning systems inspected by April 1 of each year and correct any defects by May 1 of each year. The units must run through October 31 of each year. Among other things it would also require the Department of Energy and Environment to work with the Sustainable Energy Utility and the Green Finance Authority to establish a Cooling Energy Offset grant and financing program for such owners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climatizing Our Overheated Living Spaces Regulation Amendment Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2023-09-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-05-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B25-0279 Published in the DC Register
2023-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2023-04-27CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback