DC B25-0220 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Act A25-0072 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006122, Expires on Jul 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Act A25-0072 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006122, Expires on Jul 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW90941 with Aramark Correctional Services, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW90941 with Aramark Correctional Services, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Council | Act A25-0072 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006122, Expires on Jul 23, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-04-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0072, Expires on Jul 23, 2023 |
2023-04-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-03-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |