DC B25-0200 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Educator Retention for Student Success Act of 2023
Title
Educator Retention for Student Success Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0200 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0200 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52578/Introduction/B25-0200-Introduction.pdf |