DC B25-0196 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ronald ‘Ron’ Austin Memorial Park Designation Act of 2023
Title
Ronald ‘Ron’ Austin Memorial Park Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-11-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0196 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0196 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52501/Introduction/B25-0196-Introduction.pdf |