DC B25-0167 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-167 would establish a Wheel-Lock Help Incentive Program (“WHIP”), to be administered by the Mayor, to encourage the purchase and installation of steering wheel locks or lug nut locks on an owned or leased vehicle.
Title
Wheel-Lock Help Incentive Program Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-08-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0167 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0167 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52427/Introduction/B25-0167-Introduction.pdf |