DC B25-0152 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-152 would require the Commissioner of the Department of Insurance, Securities, and Banking to establish, by a time certain, a slavery era database of records relating to slaveholding. Among other things the legislation would establish a Reparations Task Force to study and develop reparation proposals for African Americans directly wronged and traumatized by the ills of slavery, Jim Crow, and structural and institutional racism.
Title
Reparations Foundation Fund and Task Force Establishment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0152 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-02-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0152 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52386/Introduction/B25-0152-Introduction.pdf |