DC B25-0150 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Law L25-0123, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Law L25-0123, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-150 would change the motor vehicle and homeowner insurance rate filing standard to prior approval with a 90-day deemer. It would require a hearing before a rate filing is determined to be excessive or discriminatory. It would also require insurers to provide policyholders 60 day advance written notice of any rate increase of 10% or more.
Title
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner Insurance Prior Approval Rate Filing Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Council | Law L25-0123, Effective from Feb 15, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001848 |
2024-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-12-29 | Council | Act A25-0331 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016575 |
2023-12-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-12-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0331 |
2023-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2023 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-10-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-10-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0150 |
2023-10-16 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-03-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0150 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |