DC B25-0033 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-33 would abolish the Mayor and Council Compensation Advisory Commission and establish a Commission on Public Compensation, in its place, to review and make recommendations on the compensation and stipend levels for the members of the Council of the District of Columbia, the Mayor, the Attorney General, the members of the State Board of Education, and several public commissions and boards.
Title
Commission on Public Compensation Establishment Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0033 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2023-01-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0033 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52062/Introduction/B25-0033-Introduction.pdf |