DC B24-0875 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Act A24-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008827, Expires on Oct 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-22 - Act A24-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008827, Expires on Oct 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc., Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc., Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-22 | Council | Act A24-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008827, Expires on Oct 11, 2022 |
2022-07-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0477, Expires on Oct 11, 2022 |
2022-07-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 19, 2022 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-06-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |