DC B24-0736 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Final Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Final Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-736 would symbolically designate the 500 block of Foxhall Place, S.E. in Square 6126, in Ward 8 as Wilhelmina and Calvin Rolark Way, S.E.
Title
Wilhelmina and Calvin Rolark Way Symbolic Street Designation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-18 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-10-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0736 |
2022-07-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0736 Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |