DC B24-0635 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Act A24-0334 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001464, Expires on May 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Act A24-0334 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001464, Expires on May 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Emergency Act of 2022
Title
Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Emergency Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Council | Act A24-0334 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001464, Expires on May 18, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-02-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0334, Expires on May 18, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-02-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |