DC B24-0550 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 9 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-24 - Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0245, Expires on Mar 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 9 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-24 - Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0245, Expires on Mar 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Preserve Our Healthcare Workforce Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Preserve Our Healthcare Workforce Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-24 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0245, Expires on Mar 24, 2022 |
2021-12-17 | Council | Act A24-0245 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013514, Expires on Mar 24, 2022 |
2021-12-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 23, 2021 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |