DC B24-0416 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-416 modernizes most District criminal offenses currently in use as proposed by the D.C. Criminal code Reform Commission (CCRC). It would be the first comprehensive revision of the D.C. Criminal Code since 1901.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Revised Criminal Code Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - Pinto Amendment (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - Pinto Amendment (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-03 | Council | Vetoed by the Mayor |
2022-12-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 4, 2023 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-11-15 | Council | T. White Amendment (Not Considered) |
2022-11-15 | Council | Pinto Amendment |
2022-11-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-10-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0416 |
2022-10-25 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2021-12-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-12-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0416 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |