DC B24-0393 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Law L24-0105, Effective from Apr 02, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003367, Expires on Nov 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Law L24-0105, Effective from Apr 02, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003367, Expires on Nov 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Justice Involvement Reduction Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Criminal Justice Involvement Reduction Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Council | Law L24-0105, Effective from Apr 02, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003367, Expires on Nov 13, 2022 |
2022-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-12-17 | Council | Act A24-0224 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013214 |
2021-12-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0224 |
2021-11-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 13, 2021 |
2021-11-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-10-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0393 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-05 | Council | First Reading |
2021-10-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |