DC B24-0367 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-05 - Council - Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-05 - Council - Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Council | Tabled |
2021-08-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0367 Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-10 | Council | First Reading |
2021-08-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-08-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |