DC B24-0351 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Law L24-0041, Effective from Oct 27, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012182, Expires on Jun 09, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Law L24-0041, Effective from Oct 27, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012182, Expires on Jun 09, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Targeted Historic Preservation Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Targeted Historic Preservation Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Council | Law L24-0041, Effective from Oct 27, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012182, Expires on Jun 09, 2022 |
2021-09-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-09-10 | Council | Act A24-0170 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 009519 |
2021-09-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-09-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0170 |
2021-08-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 1, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-07-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0351 Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-13 | Council | First Reading |
2021-07-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |