DC B24-0339 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0073, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0073, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-339 would designate the school in square 2806 lot 0814 bounded by 14th Street NW, Gallatin St. NW, and Farragut St. NW as John Lewis Elementary School.
Title
John Lewis Elementary School Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Council | Law L24-0073, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002017 |
2022-01-14 | Council | Act A24-0269 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000188 |
2022-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0269 |
2021-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2022 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-11-02 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-10-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0339 |
2021-10-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0339 Published in the DC Register |
2021-07-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |