DC B24-0322 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Act A24-0133 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007680, Expires on Oct 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Act A24-0133 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007680, Expires on Oct 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCRL-2021-F-0061 with the Microsoft Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Contract No. DCRL-2021-F-0061 with the Microsoft Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Council | Act A24-0133 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007680, Expires on Oct 27, 2021 |
2021-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-07-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0133, Expires on Oct 27, 2021 |
2021-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |